This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/07/2023 at 11:12:55 (UTC).

Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.,Ferguson, Cleveron vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Pinellas Spine Joint, Inc ,Ferguson, Cleveron filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7075

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ferguson, Cleveron

Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Defendant Attorney

POSADA , VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/22/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/22/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less