********2625
09/08/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Hillsborough, Florida
Chandler, Cory
Murphy, J. Logan
Golijanin, Ekaterina
Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.
Geico General Insurance Company
Geico Casualty Company
LICZNERSKI,, ALEXANDER, Esquire
09/12/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order
10/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
10/09/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
10/06/2023: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
10/06/2023: AMENDED NOTICE
10/06/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
10/06/2023: AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE
10/06/2023: AMENDED NOTICE
10/06/2023: AMENDED NOTICE
10/06/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
09/12/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
09/08/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
09/08/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
09/08/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
09/08/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
09/08/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
09/08/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE
09/08/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: ** AS PER AMENDED COMPLAINT **; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Casualty Company;
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete, Inc.;
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies
[-] Read LessDocketFile Home Location - Electronic
[-] Read Less