This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/21/2023 at 04:27:44 (UTC).

DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.,GONZALEZ, IRIANELIS vs EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC ,GONZALEZ, IRIANELIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3889

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.

GONZALEZ, IRIANELIS

Defendant

EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

POPRITKIN , LAWRENCE DEAN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/13/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/14/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/10/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DIS OF TAMPA BAY, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less