This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/16/2023 at 23:46:39 (UTC).

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA vs PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8064

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER , STACEY SAMANTHA

Defendant Attorney

BRATHWAITE , PATRICK SHERMAN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/23/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/24/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/26/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/04/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/05/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

COMPLAINT

05/23/2023: COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/01/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/06/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/06/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC; Date 2: 07/05/2023; Judicial Officer:: Hooi, Michael J;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PRISTINE CONCEPTS 06/12/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PRISTINE CONCEPTS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW HAMPSHIRE CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less