This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/23/2023 at 12:09:40 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, FRANCIS vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 VASQUEZ, FRANCIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher C., Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2086

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher C.

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ, FRANCIS

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPILLER , JASON DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

ANTOS , ANN SCOLES

AMADOR , ORLANDO FRANCISCO

 

Court Documents

CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/15/2023: CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/09/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/25/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/22/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/09/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/09/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/30/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITION - 11/14/23 AT 10AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, FRANCIS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less