This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/18/2023 at 17:37:25 (UTC).

Binns, Jenni vs Washington Prime Group L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 Binns, Jenni filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Washington Prime Group L P. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh, Nash, Christopher C., Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8347

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

Nash, Christopher C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Binns, Jenni

Defendants

Dicks Sporting Goods INC

Washington Prime Group L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRANZL , BENJAMIN S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/22/2023: COMPLAINT

ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

04/24/2023: ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/29/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY

08/29/2023: REPLY

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/23/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/08/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/08/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/07/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/07/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/07/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/07/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/07/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/22/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2024
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER TO TRANSFER FROM DIVISION HT TO HOME DIVISION; Additional Info: Defendant: Dicks Sporting Goods INC; Defendant: Washington Prime Group L.P.; Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni; Private Attorney: STRANZL, BENJAMIN S; Date Signed: 08/25/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh .;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketGENERAL DIFFERENTIATED CASE MGMT ORDER PER S-2023-019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 8/9/2023 DEFT WASHINGTON PRIME GROUP LP C/O CT CORPORATION SYTEM AS RA 8/9/2023 DEFT DICKS SPORTING GOODS INC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY RA AND NOTICE OF FILING ATTCHD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM STAY; Comment: 08/04/23 ALGM; Additional Info: Defendant: Dicks Sporting Goods INC; Defendant: Washington Prime Group L.P.; Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni; Private Attorney: STRANZL, BENJAMIN S;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: Dicks Sporting Goods INC; Defendant: Washington Prime Group L.P.; Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni; Date Signed: 04/24/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Binns, Jenni;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less