This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/08/2023 at 09:56:42 (UTC).

Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC vs Russo, Samantha

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Russo, Samantha. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9249

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC

Defendants

Fregapane, James

Russo, Samantha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/30/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/30/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/30/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/02/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/02/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STIPULATION

06/08/2023: STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Fregapane, James; Defendant: Russo, Samantha;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Carrollwood Place Fee Owner LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less