This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/29/2023 at 08:06:26 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs HATCH, ELISA K

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HATCH, ELISA K. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa. A, Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5587

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Wilmington Trust, N.A.

Defendant

HATCH, ELISA K

Trustee

OneMain Financial Issuance Trust 2019-A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorney

ROLFE , AMANDA CLAY

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/15/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/31/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/29/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

06/29/2023: COURT TICKET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/12/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

07/19/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

07/19/2023: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

07/19/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/19/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2023330879; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: AFTER DEFAULT, AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE THE FACT INFORMATION SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF; Comment: JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: "AT PRETRIAL"; Additional Info: Defendant: HATCH, ELISA K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 30th day of May, 2023 ELISA K. HATCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: HATCH, ELISA K;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less