This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/17/2023 at 00:53:12 (UTC).

KERN, STEPHEN - Estate

Case Summary

On 04/03/2023 KERN, STEPHEN - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian, Pomponio, Denise. A and Pomponio, A. Denise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1196

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Pomponio, Denise. A

Pomponio, A. Denise

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Claimants and Petitioners

KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

JOHNS HOPKINS ALL CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION, INC

KERN, CHAD STEPHEN

MARTINEZ, JULIA

SHRINERS HOSPITALS FOR CHILDREN

ST. JUDE CHILDREN'S RESEARCH HOSPITAL

Decedent

KERN, STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Claimant and Petitioner Attorney

HAUBENSTOCK , SUSAN GREENBERG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketPERSONAL REPS PROOF OF CLAIM; Comment: DEBTS PAID; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 09/13/23; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: ATTY LTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketSATISFACTION-REL OF CLAIM; Comment: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA $10,340.64; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: SUSAN G HAUBENSTOCK, ESQ; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 08/10/23; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: SHRINERS HOSPITALS FOR CHILDREN; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: CHRISTINA ANNE KERN; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Comment: TRINITY MEMORIAL GARDEN FUNERAL HOME; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: CHAD STEPHEN KERN; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: JULIA MARTINEZ; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketPET TO WAIVE BOND OF PR; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: SUSAN G HAUBENSTOCK, ESQ; Additional Info: Claimant: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Personal Representative: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE; Petitioner: KERN, CHRISTINA ANNE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less