This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/14/2023 at 14:58:54 (UTC).

PETE A PALORI, JR. AMENDED AND RESTATED TRUST AGREEMENT DATED 10/3/12

Case Summary

On 07/30/2023 PETE A PALORI, JR AMENDED AND RESTATED TRUST AGREEMENT DATED 10/3/12 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2581

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Trustees and Petitioners

PALORI, JILLIAN

BANK OF AMERICA

Not Classified By Court

PALORI, PETE A, III

PETE A PALORI, JR. AMENDED AND RESTATED TRUST AGREEMENT DATED

Decedent

PALORI, PETE A, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WINER , RUSSELL ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023

DocketEND OF FILE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketDISPOSED BEFORE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketORDER (RECORD); Comment: FINAL JUDGEMENT (IN REM RELIEF ONLY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Comment: AND CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: THE BANK OF TAMPA 08/02/23; Additional Info: Trustee: PALORI, JILLIAN;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (1) rw@inherit-Florida.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Petitioner: PALORI, JILLIAN; Trustee: PALORI, JILLIAN;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT; Comment: FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; Additional Info: Petitioner: PALORI, JILLIAN; Trustee: PALORI, JILLIAN;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023

DocketTRUST NEW CASE FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less