This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/05/2023 at 20:35:16 (UTC).

Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.,DAVIS, ANNIE vs Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc ,DAVIS, ANNIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7066

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS, ANNIE

Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

Defendant

Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI,, ALEXANDER, Esquire

Defendant Attorney

MAASARANI , SAMIR ALY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/15/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/22/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/26/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/26/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less