This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/01/2023 at 07:38:34 (UTC).

West Shore LLC vs Fung, Kimone

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 West Shore LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Fung, Kimone. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7872

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

West Shore LLC

GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

Fung, Kimone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITCHIE , MITCHELL SELLERS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/21/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/21/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/22/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/24/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/31/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/11/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Comment: ***CREATED IN ERROR***

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Fung, Kimone;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less