This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/26/2023 at 04:27:08 (UTC).

Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.,BELCHER, MARY vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc ,BELCHER, MARY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7079

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELCHER, MARY

Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI,, ALEXANDER, Esquire

Defendant Attorney

POSADA , VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/20/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less