This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/30/2023 at 06:38:49 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC vs STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa. A, Allen, Lisa A and Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8252

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

GONZALES, COURTNEY

GONZALES, RICHARD

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLUMAGE , ALEXANDER CHARLES EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

FELSHER , ROSS S.

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

11/10/2023: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/28/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/23/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/22/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/22/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE

08/22/2023: NOTICE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2023489457; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: SET IN ERROR; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT TICKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERANTIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION FOR LACK OF STANDING; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(b)(I)(A); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less