This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/23/2023 at 02:11:25 (UTC).

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. vs SEDGWICK, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SEDGWICK, THOMAS. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, A. Matthew and Smith, Matthew. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5835

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, A. Matthew

Smith, Matthew. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL

SEDGWICK, THOMAS

UNKNOWN HEIRS OFTHE ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE

Defendant Attorney

TONG , DAVID J

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/16/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

E-FILED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

06/16/2023: E-FILED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

06/16/2023: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

PROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

06/13/2023: PROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/07/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

05/16/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

EXHIBIT

05/15/2023: EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

05/15/2023: EXHIBIT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: AND ASSESSMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketANSWER; Comment: OF DEFENDANTS ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL AND THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL; Additional Info: Defendant: ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OFTHE ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WITH REQUEST TO ISSUE NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ON 6/16/2023; ON OR BEFORE 07/18/2023; Additional Info: Private Attorney: BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OFTHE ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Additional Info: Defendant: ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL; Defendant: SEDGWICK, THOMAS; Defendant: UNKNOWN HEIRS OFTHE ESTATE OF ROSE PIAZZA HALL; Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Private Attorney: BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE; Date Signed: 06/13/2023; Judicial Officer:: Smith, Matthew A;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION; Comment: TO APPOINT ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FOR DEFENDANTS AND UNKNOWN PARTIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less