This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/18/2023 at 11:05:01 (UTC).

Bank Of America, N.A. vs Baker, Sharon A

Case Summary

On 09/16/2023 Bank Of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Baker, Sharon A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4647

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

Defendant

Baker, Sharon A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ , MELISSA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

09/16/2023: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/16/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/16/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/18/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/28/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER

10/17/2023: ANSWER

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/17/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

11/17/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Baker, Sharon A;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SHARON A BAKER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.; Date Served: 09/28/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Baker, Sharon A;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Bank Of America, N.A.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less