This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/16/2023 at 03:05:01 (UTC).

West Shore LLC vs Singleton, Vanessa

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 West Shore LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Singleton, Vanessa. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7897

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

West Shore LLC

GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

Singleton, Vanessa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/23/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/30/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

06/22/2023: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/22/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/22/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/22/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

05/23/2023: COMPLAINT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/28/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

07/05/2023: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/11/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/11/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/12/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2023294565; Judge: Costello, Jessica

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: (FINAL) / POSSESSION ONLY AGAINST VANESSA SINGLETON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: VSANESSA SINGLETON 05/31/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less