********7897
05/23/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Property - Residential Eviction
Hillsborough, Florida
Costello, Jessica
West Shore LLC
GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC
Singleton, Vanessa
SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD
05/23/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
05/23/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
05/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
05/24/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
05/30/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
06/22/2023: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY
06/22/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED
06/22/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT
06/22/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
05/23/2023: COMPLAINT
06/28/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
07/05/2023: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION
07/11/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
07/11/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
07/12/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessJudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2023294565; Judge: Costello, Jessica
[-] Read LessDocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION
[-] Read LessDocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: (FINAL) / POSSESSION ONLY AGAINST VANESSA SINGLETON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: VSANESSA SINGLETON 05/31/2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Singleton, Vanessa;
[-] Read LessDocketFile Home Location - Electronic
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;
[-] Read Less