This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/17/2023 at 19:42:32 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs RODIC, BOJAN

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RODIC, BOJAN. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8228

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

RODIC, BOJAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMAN , SUSANNA M.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/25/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2023: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/26/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COMPLAINT

05/24/2023: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/27/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/01/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: RODIC, BOJAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: FEE PAID; Additional Info: Defendant: RODIC, BOJAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less