This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/16/2023 at 18:25:16 (UTC).

Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc,PHILLIPS, ANGELA vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/29/2023 Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc,PHILLIPS, ANGELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, C. Melissa and Black, Melissa. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9823

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Black, C. Melissa

Black, Melissa. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc

PHILLIPS, ANGELA

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI,, ALEXANDER, Esquire

Defendant Attorney

POSADA , VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/06/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/27/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/29/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED NOTICE

09/25/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/25/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/25/2023: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED NOTICE

09/25/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE

09/25/2023: AMENDED NOTICE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/25/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/25/2023: AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2023: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/29/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST FOR

08/29/2023: REQUEST FOR

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/06/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/29/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: (AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT); Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: FEES NOT PAID - krcalderon@forthepeople.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lakewood Ranch Chiropractic, Inc;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less