This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/24/2023 at 06:31:11 (UTC).

Lake Michigan Credit Union vs Banning, George W

Case Summary

On 08/03/2023 Lake Michigan Credit Union filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Banning, George W. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher. C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4301

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lake Michigan Credit Union

Defendants and Decedents

Banning, Cassandra L

Banning, George W

Walden Lake Community Association Inc

Unknown Beneficiaries of the Banning Living Trust dated August 14, 2006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YORK , JULIE

Defendant and Decedent Attorneys

SPERRY , BRUCE J

MELTON , HOWELL WEBSTER, III

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/30/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST

10/20/2023: REQUEST

REQUEST

10/20/2023: REQUEST

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

10/06/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/25/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

09/22/2023: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

09/11/2023: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

NOTICE OF ACTION

09/11/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

09/07/2023: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2024

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 503View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: January 2, 2024 @ 11:00 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST; Comment: TO TRANSFER CASE TO EAST DIVISION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST; Comment: TO TRANSFER CASE TO EAST DIVISION; Additional Info: Defendant: Banning, Cassandra L; Defendant: Banning, George W;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: TO FORECLOSURE MEDIATION; Additional Info: Decedent: Banning, Cassandra L; Defendant: Banning, Cassandra L; Defendant: Banning, George W; Defendant: Unknown Beneficiaries of the Banning Living Trust dated August 14, 2006; Defendant: Walden Lake Community Association Inc; Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union; Private Attorney: MELTON , HOWELL WEBSTER, III; Private Attorney: SPERRY , BRUCE J; Private Attorney: YORK , JULIE; Date Signed: 09/22/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ACTION; Comment: ISSUED AND MAILED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR PUBLICATION; NOT MAILED TO DEFENDANTS AS NO POSTAGE PAID ENVELOPES PROVIDED; ON OR BEFORE 10/13/2023; Additional Info: Private Attorney: YORK , JULIE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Credit Union;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less