This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/05/2023 at 02:19:41 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY vs RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, C. Melissa, Black, Melissa. C and Black, Melissa C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2778

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Black, C. Melissa

Black, Melissa. C

Black, Melissa C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROULX , JOSEPH CHARLES

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/08/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/08/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/08/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/11/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/26/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/02/2023: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/31/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COURT TICKET

11/02/2023: COURT TICKET

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023

HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: AUDIO-VIDEO ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/6525513357 CALL IN 1 (786) 635 - 1003 MEETING ID: 652 551 3357; Judicial Officer: Black, Melissa C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: ODLPAH; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING; Instrument Number: 2023502949; Judge: Black, Melissa C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOURT TICKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AFTER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023503521; Judge: Black, Melissa C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF POSTAL AND PHYSICAL ADDRESS AND E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RYDER TRUCK RENTAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY; Date Served: 09/21/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE MOUNTAIN INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less