This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/14/2023 at 18:53:59 (UTC).

TELEEMC LLC,Granerud, Anna vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 TELEEMC LLC,Granerud, Anna filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7074

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TELEEMC LLC

Granerud, Anna

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

HOGREFE , ERIC ALAN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/03/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/05/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023293182; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TELEEMC LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less