This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/19/2023 at 00:11:15 (UTC).

MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO vs AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8236

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO

Defendant

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SONE , KARLA PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

PRODUCTION OF

05/24/2023: PRODUCTION OF

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/24/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/24/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/25/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/26/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/20/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

COMPLAINT

05/24/2023: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRODUCTION OF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOLINA DARNA, YASMANI FRANCISCO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less