This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/12/2023 at 23:29:54 (UTC).

Manahan, James P. vs Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 Manahan, James P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C., Nash, Christopher C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5254

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manahan, James P.

Defendant

Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REEDER , MATTHEW LEE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/18/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/18/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/18/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/20/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LETTER TO

09/20/2023: LETTER TO

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/20/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

04/22/2024

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Manahan, James P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY: NO REQUEST FEES; Additional Info: Private Attorney: REEDER , MATTHEW LEE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Manahan, James P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Manahan, James P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Manahan, James P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Manahan, James P.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less