This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/11/2023 at 01:59:04 (UTC).

Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.,SUCHER, TAYLOR vs Progressive American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 Pinellas Spine Joint, Inc ,SUCHER, TAYLOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive American Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3754

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.

SUCHER, TAYLOR

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/13/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/13/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/13/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/13/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/14/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/01/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Judge: Giardina, James S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive American Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pinellas Spine & Joint, Inc.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less