This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/17/2023 at 09:46:53 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING, INC,Camela, Emilio vs IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 AFO IMAGING, INC,Camela, Emilio filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3215

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP

AFO IMAGING, INC

Camela, Emilio

Defendant

IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLANE , WILLIAM JOHN, III

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/11/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/11/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/13/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

11/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

11/06/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/06/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE

11/06/2023: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516; Additional Info: Defendant: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: IMPERIAL FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AFO IMAGING, INC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less