This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/07/2023 at 04:15:33 (UTC).

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. vs CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES A HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5623

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendant

CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

VERIFICATION

05/12/2023: VERIFICATION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

05/12/2023: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

05/16/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

07/13/2023: NOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/13/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/13/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023306483; Judge: Hooi, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021; Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less