This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/26/2023 at 13:55:56 (UTC).

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. vs CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES A HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5623

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, J. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendant

CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

VERIFICATION

05/12/2023: VERIFICATION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/12/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

05/12/2023: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

05/16/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

07/13/2023: NOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/13/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/13/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

07/13/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023306483; Judge: Hooi, Michael J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: CHARLES A. HARRIS, III, TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES A HARRIS III TRUST DATED JANUARY 21, 2021; Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less