This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/08/2023 at 05:05:36 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc vs Sweeley, David

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 Jefferson Capital Systems Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sweeley, David. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael J, Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5895

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael J

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc

Defendant

Sweeley, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, HAIDAN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/15/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/15/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/16/2023: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/01/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/15/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 510 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Hooi, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DAVID SWEELEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Sweeley, David;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less