This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/04/2023 at 03:32:52 (UTC).

Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo vs Ashton Tampa Residential LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2023 Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Ashton Tampa Residential LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Peacock, Emily. A and Peacock, Emily A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3350

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila

Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo

Defendant

Ashton Tampa Residential LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

ACR FAMILY CONSTRUCTION, INC. f/k/a RANEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

AMERICAN BUILDERS SUPPLY, INC.

AP GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BJ ALUMINUM SERVICES, INC.

DALE HAYES MASONRY, INC.

HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA, LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff

ASHTON TAMPA RESIDENTIAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN , NEIL PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

DUNIGAN , CHAD NATHAN

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

SOMJI , MOHAMED Z

SHAW , JAMES M

ELLIOTT , PAUL SIDNEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/05/2023: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE

07/20/2023: NOTICE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/23/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

08/09/2023: E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/18/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

11/22/2023: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/21/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE

11/20/2023: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/13/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/07/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/07/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/14/2024

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: ASHTON TAMPA RESIDENTIAL, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 6/30/2023 DEFT ASHTON TAMPA RESIDENTIAL, LLC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY AS REGISTERED AGENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila; Plaintiff: Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ashton Tampa Residential LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila; Plaintiff: Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila; Plaintiff: Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila; Plaintiff: Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kieling Muller Gioppo, Camila; Plaintiff: Lazzari Gioppo, Carlos Eduardo;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less