This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/08/2023 at 03:56:37 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC vs Williams, Sarah

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 Jefferson Capital Systems LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Williams, Sarah. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc and Makholm, Marc. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5894

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc

Defendant

Williams, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, HAIDAN

Defendant Attorney

BERNHARDT , STEPHEN M

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/15/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/15/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/15/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/15/2023: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/28/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/09/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/09/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Williams, Sarah;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Williams, Sarah;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SARAH WILLIAMS 05/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Williams, Sarah;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less