This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/10/2023 at 02:28:48 (UTC).

PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7091

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP

LAROCQUE, KHIRA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

HOGREFE , ERIC ALAN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

05/19/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/03/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/21/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023320985; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: PREMIER WELLNESS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less