This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/18/2023 at 23:42:15 (UTC).

Kimber, Jason vs Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Kimber, Jason filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bauman, Robert A., Tesche Arkin, Caroline, Bauman, A.. Robert and Bauman, Robert. A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2717

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bauman, Robert A.

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Bauman, A.. Robert

Bauman, Robert. A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimber, Jason

Defendant

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIPPS , ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

DAVIES , ANDREW RICHMOND

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/21/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/20/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/17/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

06/26/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/01/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

05/24/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/05/2023: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/05/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

06/21/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/12/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/01/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/24/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/92333190791 MEETING ID: 923 3319 0791; Judicial Officer: Bauman, Robert A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST(S); Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less