This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/24/2023 at 04:09:58 (UTC).

Kimber, Jason vs Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 Kimber, Jason filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bauman, Robert A., Tesche Arkin, Caroline, Bauman, A.. Robert and Bauman, Robert. A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2717

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bauman, Robert A.

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Bauman, A.. Robert

Bauman, Robert. A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimber, Jason

Defendant

Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIPPS , ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

DAVIES , ANDREW RICHMOND

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/05/2023: NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/05/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/05/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

06/21/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/12/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/05/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/01/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2024

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 502View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/92333190791 MEETING ID: 923 3319 0791; Judicial Officer: Bauman, Robert A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST(S); Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Kimber, Jason;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less