This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/17/2023 at 15:02:07 (UTC).

RESCHMAN, IRA R - Estate

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 RESCHMAN, IRA R - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian, Pomponio, A. Denise and Pomponio, Denise. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1628

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Pomponio, A. Denise

Pomponio, Denise. A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner

EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS

Decedent

RESCHMAN, IRA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS , NOMIKOS MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketORD OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketEND OF FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketORD DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER FILED; Comment: FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO CONTACT THE 13TH JUDICIAL HELPDESK FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO UPLOAD ORDERS TO THE ASSIGNED JUDGE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER FILED; Comment: : FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED TO CONTACT THE 13TH JUDICIAL HELPDESK FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO UPLOAD ORDERS TO THE ASSIGNED JUDGE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 05/09/23; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: KOUSKOUTIS, NOMIKOS MICHAEL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERT-OTHER THAN PRIMARY; Comment: KRISTIN ZOANN RESCHMAN; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketPET FOR SUMMARY ADMIN W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCOPY OF PURPORTED LAST WILL - NOT ADMITTED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS; Petitioner: EDUCATION, ANASTASIA DEARMAS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less