This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/09/2023 at 03:36:12 (UTC).

J G Wentworth Originations LLC vs Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 J G Wentworth Originations LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5257

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J G Wentworth Originations LLC

Defendants

Prudential Assigned Settlement Services Corp

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT , RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/18/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

09/18/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/20/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

09/28/2023: NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING

FINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

10/30/2023: FINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2024

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Final Order Entered; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Hearing Location: WEBEX: 1-904-900-2303 OR 1-415-655-0001 ACCESS CODE: 132 571 5688; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 508View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

JudgementJudgment Code: FOAS; Judgment Description: FINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT; Instrument Number: 2023503877; Judge: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketORDER TO SEAL; Comment: ORDER SEALING UNREDACTED FINAL ORDER JUDGE A.L.G.M. 10/30/2023; Additional Info: Defendant: Prudential Assigned Settlement Services Corp; Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America; Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC; Private Attorney: PETITT , RICHARD THOMAS;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketFINAL ORDER; Comment: FINAL CONSENT ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS; Additional Info: Date 2: 10/30/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: October 30, 2023, at 9:30 a.m.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: J G Wentworth Originations LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less