This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/12/2023 at 13:04:10 (UTC).

West Shore LLC vs Hamilton, Breanna

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 West Shore LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Hamilton, Breanna. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9354

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

West Shore LLC

GRANDE OASIS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

Hamilton, Breanna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITCHIE , MITCHELL SELLERS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/14/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/14/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/14/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/14/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

07/17/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/19/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

07/30/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

07/30/2023: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/30/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

07/30/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/02/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

08/07/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

08/08/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2023346007; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamilton, Breanna;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamilton, Breanna;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamilton, Breanna; Date Served: 07/20/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Hamilton, Breanna;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Shore LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less