This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/08/2023 at 15:36:55 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING,SILVA, ROBERT vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CAREFIRST IMAGING,SILVA, ROBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7184

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

SILVA, ROBERT

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMANUEL , MATTHEW WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

MOSES , MARSHA MARIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/18/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/25/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/25/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/07/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/02/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023506431; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
05/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less