This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/19/2023 at 02:23:31 (UTC).

Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.,FROST, JACOB vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc ,FROST, JACOB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5406

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.

FROST, JACOB

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN , AMY TESS

Defendant Attorney

BRINGUIER , MICHAEL ERNESTO

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/14/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/28/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/25/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/26/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/12/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/04/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/05/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/08/2023: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

08/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

07/06/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/28/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PRIVILEGE LOG

06/28/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/25/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/12/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/04/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/14/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.; Plaintiff: FROST, JACOB;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO REPSOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY AND NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Doctor's Pain Management Group Of Brandon, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less