This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/18/2023 at 10:46:51 (UTC).

DR. CARINE CHERY, PA,CRODDY, CHRISTOPHER vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 DR CARINE CHERY, PA,CRODDY, CHRISTOPHER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7113

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DR. CARINE CHERY, PA

CRODDY, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMANUEL , MATTHEW WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

MOSES , MARSHA MARIA

KAMPF , DAVID B

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

08/21/2023: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/10/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/10/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

07/11/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/07/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/28/2023: ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/05/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/23/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

08/09/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

07/05/2023: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

07/05/2023: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

07/05/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/03/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/03/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/03/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Comment: PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 57.105 BASED ON THE POLICY'S APPLICATION OF NO-FAULT FEE SCHEDULE - NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: BASED ON FEE APPLICATION PER THE POLICY; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: BASED ON PLAINTIFF'S LACK OF STANDING AND INVALID PRE-SUIT DEMAND; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 57.105 BASED ON THE POLICY'S APPLICATION OF NO-FAULT FEE SCHEDULE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: DR. CARINE CHERY, PA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less