This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/17/2023 at 13:50:35 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.,Plummer, Jaden vs INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC ,Plummer, Jaden filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan and Chandler, Cory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3384

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Chandler, Cory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Plummer, Jaden

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEMAGO , MARC JORDAN

Defendant Attorney

GILMORE , TIERNEY ROSE

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/12/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/12/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/13/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/25/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/25/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/25/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less