This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/29/2023 at 06:31:11 (UTC).

West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC,GUERECA, MARGARITA CAMARGO vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 West Chiropractic Neuropathy Center, LLC,GUERECA, MARGARITA CAMARGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2360

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUERECA, MARGARITA CAMARGO

West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Defendant Attorney

MOSES , MARSHA MARIA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/07/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/07/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

09/07/2023: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/07/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/12/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/12/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

10/12/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/12/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

11/10/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: West Chiropractic & Neuropathy Center, LLC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less