********0016
08/29/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Other
Hillsborough, Florida
Chandler, Cory
Murphy, J. Logan
WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.
DUSSE, ROBERT D.
DUSSE, SHERI L.
BURNS , BRITTNIE MARIE
08/29/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
08/29/2023: VERIFICATION
08/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
08/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
08/29/2023: LIS PENDENS
08/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
08/31/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order
08/31/2023: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)
08/31/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
08/31/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
09/15/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
09/15/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
11/16/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
11/16/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
11/16/2023: NOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS
DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: SHERI L DUSSE 9/8/23; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ROBERT D DUSSE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.; Date Served: 09/08/2023;
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order
[-] Read LessDocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: DUSSE, ROBERT D.; Defendant: DUSSE, SHERI L.; Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: DUSSE, SHERI L.;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: DUSSE, ROBERT D.;
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketVERIFICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WALDEN LAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.;
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies
[-] Read LessDocketFile Home Location - Electronic
[-] Read Less