This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/05/2023 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,VALLE, GLADYS vs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC,VALLE, GLADYS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, S. Marc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5932

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, S. Marc

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC

VALLE, GLADYS

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

MOLLAGHAN , JOHN

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE

08/08/2023: MOTION IN LIMINE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/01/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/19/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/08/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/08/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REPLY

08/08/2023: REPLY

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

08/08/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

NOTICE

08/08/2023: NOTICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/15/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/16/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/16/2023: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/16/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/15/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Comment: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MOLLAGHAN , JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: MOLLAGHAN , JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: FEES PAID - efilings@pip-lawyers.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: FLORIDA SURGERY CONSULTANTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less