This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 11/26/2023 at 01:30:41 (UTC).

Pearson, William vs TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 Pearson, William filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh, Tesche Arkin, Caroline and Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6415

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pearson, William

Defendant

TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKWOOD , WESTLEY FRANK

Defendant Attorney

ARCHIBALD , MICHAEL GLENN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/21/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/21/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/21/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

04/12/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

04/25/2023: ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/06/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

10/06/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketORDER OF PENDING DISMISSAL; Comment: ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF RELEASE FROM STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY; Plaintiff: Pearson, William; Private Attorney: ARCHIBALD , MICHAEL GLENN; Private Attorney: LOCKWOOD , WESTLEY FRANK; Date 2: 10/02/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh .;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY; Plaintiff: Pearson, William; Date Signed: 04/25/2023;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: TAMPA ELECTRIC COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pearson, William;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pearson, William;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pearson, William;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pearson, William;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pearson, William;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less