This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/08/2023 at 15:20:57 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING,CREWS, KIMBERLY vs GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 CAREFIRST IMAGING,CREWS, KIMBERLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chandler, Cory and Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9768

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Cory

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

CREWS, KIMBERLY

Defendant

GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

BLAKE , NOAH EDWARD

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/01/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/01/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/01/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/06/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/06/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/10/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/19/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

10/27/2023: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

MOTION IN LIMINE

10/27/2023: MOTION IN LIMINE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REPLY

10/27/2023: REPLY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023

DocketREQUEST; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS REGARDING EXHAUSTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREPLY; Comment: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION IN LIMINE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
10/12/2023

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: DEFENDANT GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Defendant: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: BLAKE , NOAH EDWARD;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: CAREFIRST IMAGING;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less