This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/18/2023 at 01:15:52 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc,GUERRA, MILUSKA vs Direct General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc,GUERRA, MILUSKA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Direct General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7154

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, J. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDON MRI

GUERRA, MILUSKA

Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

Defendant

Direct General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN , DEREK WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/21/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/01/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Judge: Hooi, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less