This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/12/2023 at 09:11:37 (UTC).

MARTY HEID vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/13/2023 MARTY HEID filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul L, Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1849

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTY HEID

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAM , USTENA SARWAT

Defendant Attorney

DAVIES , ANDREW RICHMOND

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION

09/13/2023: ORDER DENYING MOTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/13/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

EMERGENCY MOTION

09/12/2023: EMERGENCY MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/14/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

07/11/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/13/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/12/2023

HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

JudgementJudgment Code: OOTF; Judgment Description: ORDER ON - TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2023432427; Judge: Huey, Paul L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 10:45 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 506View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/23; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Date 2: 09/13/2023; Judicial Officer:: Huey, Paul L;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Comment: TO RESCHULE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/23; Additional Info: Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MARTY HEID;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less