This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/18/2023 at 08:33:51 (UTC).

7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc,GONZALEZ, DANYELIS vs Direct General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc,GONZALEZ, DANYELIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Direct General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph. M and Tompkins, M. Joseph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7138

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, Joseph. M

Tompkins, M. Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc

GONZALEZ, DANYELIS

Defendant

Direct General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRA , NELSON ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/19/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/23/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

05/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/21/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

06/30/2023: MOTION TO STRIKE

INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2023: INTERROGATORIES

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/17/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/17/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/28/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023332899; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: 7520 Rehabilitation Center, Llc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less